Global Patent Index - EP 0931301 B1

EP 0931301 B1 2000-05-24 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING DATA ON TRAFFIC ASSESSMENT

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING DATA ON TRAFFIC ASSESSMENT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERMITTLUNG VON DATEN ZUR VERKEHRSLAGEBEURTEILUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES POUR L'EVALUATION DE LA SITUATION DU TRAFIC

Publication

EP 0931301 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97912055 A

Priority

  • DE 9702360 W
  • DE 19643454 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19643454A1] The invention relates to a method for wireless transmission of data on traffic assessment in route sections of a road system to a central station. The data are captured in a plurality of vehicles that are equipped with the appropriate sensor technology for data collecting and are moving in traffic flow (floating cars). The data collected by the sensor in the vehicle is converted into driving profiles. According to the invention, is its foreseen that characteristic features in the sense of actual values on the basis of current driving profile are derived in the vehicle; characteristic driving profile features in the sense of expected values on the basis of predetermined traffic-status information are developed in the vehicle; the actual value and the expected values of the driving profile features are compared with each other; the differences resulting from the comparison are assessed on the basis of predetermined decision criteria in the vehicle, and the transmission of data concerning the traffic-status assessment to the central station takes place only in cases foreseen according to the decision criteria.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/0967

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/00 (2006.01); G08G 1/01 (2006.01); G08G 1/09 (2006.01); G08G 1/0967 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/096716 (2013.01); G08G 1/0112 (2013.01); G08G 1/0133 (2013.01); G08G 1/0141 (2013.01); G08G 1/09675 (2013.01); G08G 1/096775 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19643454 A1 19980423; DE 19643454 C2 20030821; AT 193391 T 20000615; DE 59701785 D1 20000629; EP 0931301 A1 19990728; EP 0931301 B1 20000524; JP 2000507732 A 20000620; JP 3382625 B2 20030304; US 6178374 B1 20010123; WO 9815935 A1 19980416

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051229

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MANNESMANN A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20041031

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-09-13 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20060505

2006-09-13 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Free Format Text: 20060505

2006-01-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060113

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-12-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051229

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-12-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051227

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20050501

2005-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-06-01 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: GEDAS TELEMATICS GMBH

- Effective date: 20010220

2005-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050501

2005-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MANNESMANN A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-11-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: ATX EUROPE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2004-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041007

2004-09-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ATX EUROPE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2004-06-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: GEDAS TELEMATICS GMBH

2004-03-24 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: GEDAS TELEMATICS GMBH

- Effective date: 20010220

2004-03-24 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ATX EUROPE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2003-10-17 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031017

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-10-01 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031001

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-10-01 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031001

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030930

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-08-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: VODAFONE HOLDING GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2003-06-11 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VODAFONE HOLDING GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2003-05-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: VODAFONE AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2003-03-12 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VODAFONE AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2002-12-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: GEDAS TELEMATICS GMBH

2002-10-16 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: GEDAS TELEMATICS GMBH

- Effective date: 20010220

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: GEDAS TELEMATICS GMBH

2001-04-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: GEDAS TELEMATICS GMBH

- Effective date: 20010220

2000-08-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000824

2000-07-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701785

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-29

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-05-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-05-24 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 193391

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990817

1999-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990329

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE