Global Patent Index - EP 0931321 B1

EP 0931321 B1 2000-12-20 - CONTACT ASSEMBLY WITH A POSISTOR

Title (en)

CONTACT ASSEMBLY WITH A POSISTOR

Title (de)

KONTAKTGRUPPE MIT EINEM KALTLEITER

Title (fr)

GROUPE DE CONTACT COMPRENANT UN POSISTOR

Publication

EP 0931321 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97909157 A

Priority

  • DE 9702118 W
  • DE 19638631 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19638631A1] The present invention relates to a contact assembly for semiconductor resistors, consisting of a set of contact elements (5a, 5b) asymmetrically arranged so that they lean, staggered in relation to each other, against the opposite side surfaces of an electrical structural member.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01C 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01C 1/14 (2006.01); H01C 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01C 1/1406 (2013.01); H01C 1/014 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE DK ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19638631 A1 19980402; DE 19638631 C2 20020926; AT 198242 T 20010115; BR 9712835 A 19991116; CN 1231054 A 19991006; DK 0931321 T3 20010212; EP 0931321 A1 19990728; EP 0931321 B1 20001220; ES 2153185 T3 20010216; JP 2001500672 A 20010116; KR 20010029532 A 20010406; MY 133747 A 20071130; US 6160473 A 20001212; WO 9812713 A1 19980326

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-06-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59702793

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140401

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120920

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-07-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050918

2005-09-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050918

2005-09-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050918

2004-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030919

2004-09-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040920

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-09-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040915

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-05-10 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2003-09-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-09-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030918

2002-10-09 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021009

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-09-03 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020903

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-09-02 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020902

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-03-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010307

2001-03-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2153185

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-02-12 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2001-02-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-01-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702793

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-01-25

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB IT

2000-12-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 198242

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-01-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-07-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EPCOS AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991013

1999-10-13 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: CONTACT ASSEMBLY WITH A POSISTOR

1999-09-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: CONTACT ASSEMBLY WITH A POSISTOR

1999-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990305

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB IT