Global Patent Index - EP 0931323 B1

EP 0931323 B1 2000-02-02 - MULTIWIRE PARALLEL CONDUCTOR FOR WINDINGS OF ELECTRICAL MACHINES AND APPLIANCES

Title (en)

MULTIWIRE PARALLEL CONDUCTOR FOR WINDINGS OF ELECTRICAL MACHINES AND APPLIANCES

Title (de)

MEHRFACHPARALLELLEITER FÜR WICKLUNGEN ELEKTRISCHER MASCHINEN UND GERÄTE

Title (fr)

CONDUCTEUR PARALLELE MULTIFILAIRE POUR ENROULEMENTS DE MACHINES ET D'APPAREILS ELECTRIQUES

Publication

EP 0931323 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97942693 A

Priority

  • AT 9700208 W
  • AT 172796 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9814964A1] The invention seeks to obtain a multiwire parallel conductor with properties meeting the required mechanical and electric criteria during and after winding and after hardening, and excluding with all certainty non oil impregnable gas inclusions in narrow sides and rim area. Enamel-insulated wire conductors (1) are coated with adhesive resin (2) on longitudinal contact surfaces and wrapped with paper insulation (3). The conductor bundle hardens afterwards. The adhesive area should represent approximately 80 % of the contact surface and the edge area must remain free of adhesive. In practice epoxy resins in a partially cross-linked state, so-called state B, have proved useful on account of their good winding properties, viscosity and shorter hardening times. Indicated design enables the conductor bundle to mechanically withstand the press-in process and associated shear strain after hardening of adhesive layers and does not impair the required electric strength of about 4.5kV/mm. The invention primarily guarantees that there will be no inclusions of air or gas bubbles which could otherwise lead to glow effects.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 27/32; H01F 27/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/28 (2006.01); H01F 27/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/2823 (2013.01); H01F 27/323 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9814964 A1 19980409; AT 189555 T 20000215; DE 59701100 D1 20000309; EP 0931323 A1 19990728; EP 0931323 B1 20000202

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160929

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000321

2000-03-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701100 20000309

2000-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189555 T 20000215

1999-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990726

1999-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981125

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE