Global Patent Index - EP 0931369 B1

EP 0931369 B1 2001-05-23 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING COMMUTATORS AND COMMUTATOR MADE ACCORDING TO THIS METHOD

Title (en)

METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING COMMUTATORS AND COMMUTATOR MADE ACCORDING TO THIS METHOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON KOMMUTATOREN UND NACH DEM VERFAHREN HERGESTELLTER KOMMUTATOR

Title (fr)

MODE DE FABRICATION DE COMMUTATEURS, ET COMMUTATEUR FABRIQUE SELON LE PROCEDE EN QUESTION

Publication

EP 0931369 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97909250 A

Priority

  • DE 19642138 A
  • EP 9704970 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19642138A1] Disclosed is a method for manufacturing switches, whereby a plurality of segments (3) of a metal material are placed in an assembly basket (1) to form a segment lattice. Said lattice is compressed using an insulating material mouldable in a die, thereby producing an insulating body with embedded segments (3), into which the assembly basket (1) is moulded as a fixed integrated component part.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 39/04; H01R 43/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 39/04 (2006.01); H01R 43/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/06 (2013.01); H01R 39/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19642138 A1 19980423; EP 0931369 A1 19990728; EP 0931369 B1 20010523; ES 2158509 T3 20010901; WO 9816979 A1 19980423

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-07-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59703617

- Effective date: 20120403

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100924

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080912

2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080912

2009-11-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080912

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080911

2009-07-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090529

2009-06-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20090508

2008-06-13 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070925

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [REG SI SP73] CHANGE OF DATA ON OWNER

- Owner name: KOLEKTOR KAUTT & BUX GMBH; DE

- Effective date: 20080222

2008-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070926

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-03-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070919

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-09-03 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070903

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-10-31 [REG SI SP73] CHANGE OF DATA ON OWNER

- Owner name: KAUTT & BUX GMBH; DE

- Effective date: 20050823

2005-10-14 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2005-09-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2158509 T3

2001-07-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703617 20010628

2001-06-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUZZI, NOTARO&ANTONIELLI D'OULX

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19990211

2000-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000926

2000-08-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING COMMUTATORS AND COMMUTATOR MADE ACCORDING TO THIS METHOD

1999-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990211

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT SE

1999-07-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19990211