Global Patent Index - EP 0931434 B1

EP 0931434 B1 2001-03-28 - ELECTRIC RADIATING TUBE, GENERATOR AND DIFFUSER OF HEAT, OF INSULATING AND OF HIGHLY CONDUCTING SPIRALLED BANDS

Title (en)

ELECTRIC RADIATING TUBE, GENERATOR AND DIFFUSER OF HEAT, OF INSULATING AND OF HIGHLY CONDUCTING SPIRALLED BANDS

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHES STRAHLUNGSROHR,WÄRMEGENERATOR UND DIFFUSOR AUS ISOLIERENDEN UND HOCHKONDUKTIVEN SPIRALFÖRMIG GEWICKELTEN BÄNDERN

Title (fr)

TUBE ELECTRONIQUE RAYONNANT, GENERATEUR ET DIFFUSEUR DE CHALEUR, A BANDES SPIRALEES ISOLANTES ET TRES CONDUCTRICES

Publication

EP 0931434 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96941820 A

Priority

  • IT 9600252 W
  • IT MI962077 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9816087A1] Electric radiating tube (30) for generating and diffusing heat obtained with spirally wound bands (20-23), entirely or partially superimposed, one or more of said bands (20, 22) being of electrically insulating material and one or more of said bands (21, 23) being of highly conducting material, thickness being measured in microns with an extremely high ratio between area and thickness, and of a constant cross section, there being at the ends of said tube (30) means of connection and contact (32, 43, 44) for electric feed, said means being connected to one or more of the highly conducting bands (21, 23).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 3/10; F24C 7/04; H05B 3/16; H05B 3/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/04 (2006.01); H05B 3/10 (2006.01); H05B 3/16 (2006.01); H05B 3/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/46 (2013.01); F24C 7/043 (2013.01); H05B 3/10 (2013.01); H05B 3/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9816087 A1 19980416; AT 200173 T 20010415; AU 1109497 A 19980505; DE 69612306 D1 20010503; EP 0931434 A1 19990728; EP 0931434 B1 20010328; IT 1285481 B1 19980608; IT MI962077 A1 19980408; TW 381406 B 20000201

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-02 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2002-08-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011216

2002-03-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-17 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011217

2001-12-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011216

2001-12-16 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011216

2001-12-16 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011216

2001-09-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-09-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-09-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-08-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-06-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010629

2001-06-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010629

2001-06-28 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010628

2001-06-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010628

2001-06-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010628

2001-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612306 20010503

2001-04-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2001-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200173 T 20010415

1999-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990722

1999-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990318

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE LI LU MC NL PT SE