Global Patent Index - EP 0931470 A3

EP 0931470 A3 2001-04-25 - Sandwich-type footwear stiffening element of rigid or at least semi-rigid behaviour, usable as part of the sole unit or insole

Title (en)

Sandwich-type footwear stiffening element of rigid or at least semi-rigid behaviour, usable as part of the sole unit or insole

Title (de)

Starre oder halbstarre Sandwichversteifung für Schuhwerk, verwendbar für die Sohle oder Brandsohle

Title (fr)

Raidisseur du type sandwich rigide ou semi-rigide, utilisable comme partie de la semelle ou de la première de montage

Publication

EP 0931470 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98124514 A

Priority

IT MI980076 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0931470A2] For a lower part (4) of footwear (2, 3), an element of rigid or semi-rigid behaviour suitable for use as the sole unit or as an insole or internal foot support for the footwear, this latter comprising a vamp (7) associated with the lower portion (4) of the footwear. Said element (1) comprises at least three mutually associated layer portions (13, 14, 15) defining a sandwich structure (1A); the outer portions (13, 14) having greater rigidity than the inner portion (15), these portions being stably joined together to form a single body (1A). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 13/12; A43B 13/41

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/00 (2006.01); A43B 13/04 (2006.01); A43B 13/12 (2006.01); A43B 13/38 (2006.01); A43B 13/41 (2006.01); A43B 13/42 (2006.01); A43B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 13/026 (2013.01); A43B 5/049 (2013.01); A43B 7/141 (2013.01); A43B 7/142 (2013.01); A43B 13/12 (2013.01); A43B 13/41 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0931470 A2 19990728; EP 0931470 A3 20010425; AU 1210999 A 19990805; BR 9900055 A 19991228; CA 2257443 A1 19990716; CN 1232653 A 19991027; CZ 9900136 A3 19990811; IL 127742 D0 19991028; IT 1298146 B1 19991220; IT MI980076 A1 19990716; JP H11244003 A 19990914; KR 19990067925 A 19990825; NO 990195 A 19990719; NO 990195 D0 19990115; SK 999 A3 20000313; TW 411260 B 20001111

INPADOC legal status


2002-02-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010703

2002-02-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-07-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI