Global Patent Index - EP 0931478 B1

EP 0931478 B1 2002-12-04 - Foldable boulevard table

Title (en)

Foldable boulevard table

Title (de)

Klapptisch nach Art eines Boulevardtischs

Title (fr)

Table pliante de type table de bistrot

Publication

EP 0931478 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98124640 A

Priority

DE 19801660 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0931478A1] The stirrup ribs (6,7) in the usage position are arranged in the center of the table top near to each other and are fixed by horizontally penetrating screws to a common table center of plastic. Their star-shaped outwardly extending lower legs (9) form the stand feet. The upper legs (10,11,12) are fixed to the table top. At least two legs (4) with their stirrup ribs (7) are each fitted to a pivot bearing with a vertical axis and after release of their stirrup legs (11,12) are foldable with their further legs (3) to the tabletop with virtually parallel planes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 3/08 (2013.01); A47B 3/0803 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19801660 A1 19990722; AT 228790 T 20021215; EP 0931478 A1 19990728; EP 0931478 B1 20021204

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20171215

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171213

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-05-15 [REG AT HC] CHANGE OF THE FIRM NAME OR FIRM ADDRESS

- Owner name: SIEGER GMBH, DE

- Document: AT 228790 T

- Effective date: 20120327

2012-01-18 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20120109

2011-09-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SIEGER GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SIEGER GMBH & CO.KG, 77839 LICHTENAU, DE

- Document: DE 59806525

- Effective date: 20110728

2011-09-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59806525

- Representative's name: LICHTI PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20110728

2011-09-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59806525

- Representative's name: LICHTI - PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20110728

2011-08-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SIEGER GMBH

- Free text: SIEGER GMBH & CO. KG#LANDSTRASSE 14#77839 LICHTENAU (DE) -TRANSFER TO- SIEGER GMBH#LANDSTRASSE 14#77839 LICHTENAU (DE)

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091224

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-07-27 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081222

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-28 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2009-08-28 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2009-05-06 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: SIEGER GMBH + CO. KG

2009-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20081217

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-02-27 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SIEGER GMBH & CO. KG

- Free text: SIEGER GMBH + CO.# #77837 LICHTENAU (DE) -TRANSFER TO- SIEGER GMBH & CO. KG#LANDSTRASSE 14#77839 LICHTENAU (DE)

2005-12-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051223

2003-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-07-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806525 20030116

2003-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2002-12-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI NL SE

2002-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228790 T 20021215

2002-10-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI NL SE

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020510

2000-06-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-06-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH ES FR LI NL SE

2000-05-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH ES LI NL SE

2000-04-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH ES FR LI NL

2000-04-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE IT LI NL SE

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000117

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI NL SE

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH ES FR LI NL SE

1999-07-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI