Global Patent Index - EP 0931567 A3

EP 0931567 A3 2000-05-31 - Safety device against avalanches

Title (en)

Safety device against avalanches

Title (de)

Sicherheitseinrichtung gegen Lawinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de sécurité contre les avalanches

Publication

EP 0931567 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99830022 A

Priority

IT BO980022 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0931567A2] The invention relates to a safety device against avalanches, comprising a support (1), generally fastened to a trekking backpack, provided with means (2) for fastening to a user of the device (10), an inflatable balloon (3) and related means (4) for inflating the balloon (3), as well as extendible fastening means (5) interposed between the support (1) and the balloon (3), able to allow the balloon (3), once inflated, to rise freely whilst remaining attached to the support (1). The device (10) further comprises preferably an inflatable cushion (9) having at least two arms (12) with lateral development with respect to the user's body. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62B 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 13/018 (2006.01); A62B 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62B 33/00 (2013.01); A41D 13/018 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0931567 A2 19990728; EP 0931567 A3 20000531; IT 1299820 B1 20000404; IT BO980022 A1 19990723; IT BO980022 D0 19980123

INPADOC legal status


2009-02-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20080801

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1999-07-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI