Global Patent Index - EP 0931604 B1

EP 0931604 B1 2003-06-04 - Method and apparatus for manufacturing composite camshafts

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for manufacturing composite camshafts

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von gebauten Nockenwellen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication d'arbres à cames composés

Publication

EP 0931604 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98123711 A

Priority

DE 19802484 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0931604A1] The probe (13) has a pressure fluid feed channel (14) connected to a fluid high pressure production unit. A sealing arrangement (24,25) for the hollow shaft (7) is provided on the section (21) of the cam (4) to be joined and in the area (19) of a bearing point. The sealing arrangement contains two sealing bodies (24,25) arranged axially spaced apart and around the probe. The sealing bodies limit the areas (19,21) of the hollow shaft to be widened, axially on both sides with support on the inside (27) of the hollow shaft. The sealing arrangement for the bearing point (20) contains a support tool, which in the usage position locates rigidly on the outside of the hollow shaft, leaving free the area of the hollow shaft to be widened, thereby covering the sealing bodies (24,25). Tools are provided for alignment, positioning and retention of the cam (4),

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 53/84; F16C 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 26/02 (2011.01); B21D 26/033 (2011.01); B21D 53/84 (2006.01); B23P 19/027 (2006.01); F01L 1/047 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 39/20 (2013.01); B21D 26/033 (2013.01); B21D 39/04 (2013.01); B21D 39/06 (2013.01); B21D 39/08 (2013.01); B21D 53/845 (2013.01); F01L 1/047 (2013.01); F01L 2001/0475 (2013.01); F01L 2103/01 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49293 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49805 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49895 (2013.01); Y10T 29/4992 (2013.01); Y10T 29/4994 (2013.01); Y10T 29/5383 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53961 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53996 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0931604 A1 19990728; EP 0931604 B1 20030604; DE 19802484 A1 19990805; DE 19802484 C2 20000608; ES 2198638 T3 20040201; US 2002056195 A1 20020516; US 6347451 B1 20020219; US 6615468 B2 20030909

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-01-15 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2010-01-15 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071212

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071213

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2009-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20071213

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071212

2008-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081020

2008-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071213

2008-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071212

2008-08-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061212

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20061228

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061221

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-13 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20061213

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-03-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2198638 T3

2003-10-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-09-23 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808621 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020619

2000-04-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990701

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-07-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI