Global Patent Index - EP 0931605 A3

EP 0931605 A3 2000-05-03 - Method for producing an elongated hollow body and its use

Title (en)

Method for producing an elongated hollow body and its use

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines länglichen Hohlkörpers und dessen Anwendung

Title (fr)

Méthode de production d'un corps creux allongé et son utilisation

Publication

EP 0931605 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98118631 A

Priority

DE 19802685 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0931605A2] The naturally hard aluminum or hardenable aluminum alloy manganese and the hardenable aluminum alloy can be aluminum magnesium silicium 1. At least two plates of different wall thickness are joined together and the resultant plate is shaped to form a hollow body. Finally, the body longitudinal edges are seamed together. The hollow body by hydraulic inner high pressure shaping is then brought to its final configuration.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 53/88; B62D 65/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 51/16 (2006.01); B21C 37/06 (2006.01); B21D 26/02 (2011.01); B21D 26/057 (2011.01); B21D 53/88 (2006.01); B62D 65/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 26/057 (2013.01); B21C 37/06 (2013.01); B21C 37/065 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0931605 A2 19990728; EP 0931605 A3 20000503; EP 0931605 B1 20011219; BR 9804252 A 19991207; CZ 295791 B6 20051116; CZ 9803222 A3 19991013; DE 19802685 A1 19990729; ES 2166584 T3 20020416; PT 931605 E 20020628

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2008-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061002

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061001

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070629

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061001

2007-06-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2007-04-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2007-04-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2005-10-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051018

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-14 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051014

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-13 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20051013

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20050927

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050919

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050909

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020318

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2166584 T3

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802523 20020131

2002-01-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011231

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010406

2001-05-23 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ELONGATED HOLLOW BODY

2001-03-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ELONGATED HOLLOW BODY

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001024

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

1999-07-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI