Global Patent Index - EP 0931610 B1

EP 0931610 B1 2003-06-25 - Apparatus and process for feeding with metal horizontal and vertical cold chamber pressure die casting machines

Title (en)

Apparatus and process for feeding with metal horizontal and vertical cold chamber pressure die casting machines

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Metallbeschickung waage-und senkrechter Kaltkammer-Druckgiessmaschinen und Verfahren

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour alimenter en métal des machines à coulée sous pression à chambre froide horizontales et verticales

Publication

EP 0931610 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99101026 A

Priority

DE 19802342 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19802342C1] The pressure or suction pipe (16, 28) forms a hermetically sealed connection with the pressure chamber flange (9). A gas application piston (11) with a guide sleeve (12) is located between the pressure piston (10) and its drive rod (13). The melt transport container is provided with a plate which floats on the surface of the melt during its delivery and return (in the case of a surplus amount).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 17/08; B22D 17/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 17/08 (2006.01); B22D 17/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 17/30 (2013.01); B22D 17/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19802342 C1 19990304; EP 0931610 A1 19990728; EP 0931610 B1 20030625; ES 2201575 T3 20040316; US 6318444 B1 20011120

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-07-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080729

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2010-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090122

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090202

2010-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090122

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090121

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070121

2009-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090121

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080709

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080716

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080725

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080717

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-04-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2201575 T3

2003-12-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906050 P 20030731

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OHNSMANN, GUSTAV

2003-05-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: OHNSMANN, GUSTAV

2003-05-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BANDT, GEROLD

2000-04-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000120

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-07-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI