Global patent index - EP 0931667 A3

EP 0931667 A3 2000-01-12 - Optical writing printer head, printer, and print system

Title (en)

Optical writing printer head, printer, and print system

Title (de)

Optischer Druckerschreibkopf, Drucker, und Druckanordnung

Title (fr)

Tête d'écriture optique, imprimante, et système d'impression

Publication

EP 0931667 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99300459 A

Priority

JP 1153598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0931667A2] An optical writing printer head which can accomplish at the same time the miniaturisation and lower cost of a printer head and the assurance of the resolution of print pixels. In a printer head where an LED 2 for emitting blue light, and LED 3 for emitting green light, and an LED 4 for emitting red light are mounted on a substrate 1, the whole is covered with a cover 5, and the exposure dot sizes are restricted by apertures 6, 7, and 8 corresponding to the respective LEDs and provided in the cover 5. The sizes of the apertures depends on the colour of the light source with which each is associated. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/465; B41J 2/48; B41J 2/525

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/445 (2006.01); B41J 2/44 (2006.01); B41J 2/465 (2006.01); B41J 2/48 (2006.01); B41J 2/525 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/525 (2013.01); B41J 2/465 (2013.01); B41J 2/48 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0931667 A2 19990728; EP 0931667 A3 20000112; EP 0931667 B1 20041110; DE 69921706 D1 20041216; DE 69921706 T2 20051006; JP 3234186 B2 20011204; JP H11208021 A 19990803

INPADOC legal status

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051209

- Year of fee payment: 08

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070121

2007-11-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070930

2007-09-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070121

2007-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070801

2006-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 08

2006-01-04 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060104

- Year of fee payment: 08

2005-12-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051209

- Year of fee payment: 08

2005-11-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050811

2005-10-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69921706

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20041216

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-11-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY

2003-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031017

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000612

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-07-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI