Global patent index - EP 0931670 A3

EP 0931670 A3 2000-01-26 - Colour printer

Title (en)

Colour printer

Title (de)

Farbdrucker

Title (fr)

Imprimante couleur

Publication

EP 0931670 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99107681 A

Priority

  • EP 96115057 A
  • JP 26614895 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0764545A2] A printer comprising a key-in unit (11), a cartridge detecting unit (12), a data storage (13), a ROM (14), a font memory (15), a display control unit (16), a display (17), a print control unit (18), a printing unit (19), and a controller (20). When a cartridge which contains a printing medium is placed in the printing unit (19), the color of the printing medium is then determined through the cartridge detecting unit (12). The user inputs character data, etc., without specifying any print colors from the key-in unit (11). The input character data is then stored in the data storage (13). When such input character data is printed, the controller (20) automatically sets the color of a character printing pattern at a color predetermined in correspondence to the color of the printing medium determined through the cartridge detecting unit (12). The printing unit (19) prints the character data, etc., in the color set by the controller (20). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 3/407; B41J 35/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/175 (2006.01); B41J 3/407 (2006.01); B41J 3/46 (2006.01); B41J 29/393 (2006.01); B41J 35/18 (2006.01); G06K 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/17546 (2013.01); B41J 3/4075 (2013.01); B41J 3/46 (2013.01); B41J 29/393 (2013.01); B41J 35/18 (2013.01); G06K 15/00 (2013.01); G06K 2215/0025 (2013.01); G06K 2215/0097 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0764545 A2 19970326; EP 0764545 A3 19970813; EP 0764545 B1 20010103; CN 1078539 C 20020130; CN 1152499 A 19970625; DE 69611412 D1 20010208; DE 69611412 T2 20010503; DE 69619874 D1 20020418; DE 69619874 T2 20020627; EP 0931670 A2 19990728; EP 0931670 A3 20000126; EP 0931670 B1 20020313; HK 1013413 A1 20010921; KR 100201300 B1 19990615; US 5890820 A 19990406

INPADOC legal status

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140919

2015-06-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150529

2015-06-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69619874

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-05-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140919

2015-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69619874

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CASIO COMPUTER CO. LTD

- Effective date: 20130930

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130910

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130918

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130911

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120912

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-03-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021216

2002-08-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69619874

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20020418

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-03-13 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Document Number: 764545

- Country of Ref Document: EP

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2002-03-06 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010425

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

1999-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990416

1999-07-28 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Document Number: 764545

- Country of Ref Document: EP

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB