Global Patent Index - EP 0931709 B1

EP 0931709 B1 2002-09-18 - Overhead conveyor, especially electric overhead conveyor with monorail

Title (en)

Overhead conveyor, especially electric overhead conveyor with monorail

Title (de)

Hängebahn, insbesondere Einschienen-Elektrohängebahn

Title (fr)

Convoyeur suspendu, notamment convoyeur éléctrique suspendu avec monorail

Publication

EP 0931709 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98250455 A

Priority

DE 19802186 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19802186C1] The suspension track has at least one movable drive mechanism on the rail with at least two friction wheels which act upon an auxiliary rail (14) parallel to the rail (5). The friction wheels (15), a connecting element (16) and a spring element (23) form a unit guided on the drive mechanism (1) so that it can be moved about a rolling wheel (3) into a rest position in which the forward friction wheel (15v) lies in a space between the rails and from which the rear wheel (15h) can be pivoted into the operating position by contact with the auxiliary rail.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61C 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61C 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61C 13/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19802186 C1 19990311; BR 9900067 A 20000208; DK 0931709 T3 20021223; EP 0931709 A1 19990728; EP 0931709 B1 20020918; ES 2184198 T3 20030401; US 6178891 B1 20010130

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-10-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805601

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805601

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130218

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071230

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070102

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070102

2008-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070102

2008-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070102

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061230

2007-10-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070831

2007-09-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070701

2007-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061230

2007-08-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-08-06 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2007-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070701

2006-12-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-01-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060118

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051216

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-09 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20051209

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051208

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-08 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20051208

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-05 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20051205

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184198 T3

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-23 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021126

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805601 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-03-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2000-04-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

1999-10-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990816

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

1999-07-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI