Global Patent Index - EP 0931740 A3

EP 0931740 A3 2000-05-31 - Device for sensing an edge of a stack of sheets in a sheet feeder

Title (en)

Device for sensing an edge of a stack of sheets in a sheet feeder

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Abtaten einer Stapelkante eines Bogenstapels in einem Bogenanleger

Title (fr)

Dispositif de détection d'un bord d'une pile de feuilles dans un margeur de feuilles

Publication

EP 0931740 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99100789 A

Priority

DE 29801061 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0931740A2] An approximately vertical stack (1) of flat sheets of paper stands on a lifting jack ready for removal from the top one sheet at a time by e.g. a suction device serving e.g. a print machine. The exact position of the stack side is ascertained by a sensor which consists of a touch-wheel (6) on an arm (7) linked to a switch (9) and held in position by a spring (14). As the stack is raised the sensor wheel defines the position of the stack edge to within a fine tolerance. The exact position of the stack can then be adjusted for precision pick-up of the top sheet of paper. The sensor is non-linear.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 7/02; B65H 9/00; H01H 21/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 7/10 (2013.01); B65H 2511/17 (2013.01); B65H 2511/20 (2013.01); B65H 2511/212 (2013.01); B65H 2511/512 (2013.01); B65H 2553/612 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/17 + B65H 2220/01 + B65H 2220/11
  2. B65H 2511/20 + B65H 2220/02 + B65H 2220/11
  3. B65H 2511/512 + B65H 2220/01
  4. B65H 2511/212 + B65H 2220/01 + B65H 2220/11
  5. B65H 2511/20 + B65H 2220/02 + B65H 2220/03

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29801061 U1 19980312; AT 217598 T 20020615; EP 0931740 A2 19990728; EP 0931740 A3 20000531; EP 0931740 B1 20020515

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59901425

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-09-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 217598 T

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120120

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MANROLAND SHEETFED GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MANROLAND AG, 63075 OFFENBACH, DE

- Document: DE 59901425

- Effective date: 20120510

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120210

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-10-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-09-08 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040118

2004-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040118

2003-05-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030218

2003-01-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030110

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021227

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-18 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20021218

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-08-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901425 20020620

2002-06-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020516

2002-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2002-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-05-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 217598 T 20020615

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010906

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB LI

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65H 7/02 A, 7B 65H 9/00 B, 7H 01H 21/28 B

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

1999-07-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI