Global Patent Index - EP 0931743 A3

EP 0931743 A3 2000-06-07 - Winding device with king rolls

Title (en)

Winding device with king rolls

Title (de)

Tragwalzen-Wickelvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de bobinage avec cylindres porteurs

Publication

EP 0931743 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98124783 A

Priority

DE 19801599 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0931743A2] Both first (2) and second support roller (3) are power-driven and vacuum is addressed to the roller (1) surface during the coiling stage. Roller (2) has a number of peripheral holes (11) in its surface connected to a vacuuming device (12) depending on their angle of turn, the channels of larger section than each hole. The vacuum can be adjusted and should be less when coiling than when changing rollers. Support roller (2) is made of axially stacked and mutually aligned elements, each with elastic upper surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 18/20; B65H 18/26; B65H 19/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/20 (2013.01); B65H 2406/13 (2013.01); B65H 2406/30 (2013.01); B65H 2406/33 (2013.01); B65H 2406/3612 (2013.01); B65H 2408/2321 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19801599 A1 19990722; EP 0931743 A2 19990728; EP 0931743 A3 20000607; EP 0931743 B1 20030402; US 6250581 B1 20010626

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071229

2006-12-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061218

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-14 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20061214

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041229

2004-12-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041229

2004-03-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040105

2003-12-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031217

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031124

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807733 P 20030508

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2003-04-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI FR GB

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000624

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65H 18/20 A, 7B 65H 18/26 B, 7B 65H 19/26 B

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

1999-07-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI