Global Patent Index - EP 0931751 A3

EP 0931751 A3 2000-04-26 - Method and apparatus for withdrawing an elongated element from a storage supply as well as a method for making the storage supply

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for withdrawing an elongated element from a storage supply as well as a method for making the storage supply

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Ausziehen eines langgestreckten Elements aus einem Vorrat sowie Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Vorrats

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour extraire un élément allongé d'une réserve ainsi que procédé pour faire la réserve

Publication

EP 0931751 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99400070 A

Priority

DE 19802903 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0931751A2] The method involves extracting an elongated element (1) from a reserve (3) lying in windings (5), in direction of a winding axis. Guides are coupled to the reserve, which fix the element vertically to its longitudinal axis (11), whereby the element is turned in such way around its longitudinal axis, that it is torsion-free, and that the turn results in a first guide which follows the reserve directly. Independent claims are included for an extracting arrangement, and for a method for manufacturing the reserve.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 75/36; B65H 49/02; B65H 55/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 75/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 75/362 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0931751 A2 19990728; EP 0931751 A3 20000426; DE 19802903 A1 19990729

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-11-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001027

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 65H 75/36 A, 7B 65H 49/02 B, 7B 65H 55/04 B

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-07-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI