Global Patent Index - EP 0931816 A4

EP 0931816 A4 2000-08-09 - NORBORNENE POLYMER COMPOSITION

Title (en)

NORBORNENE POLYMER COMPOSITION

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNG AUF BASIS VON NORBORNENPOLYMERE

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION A BASE D'UN POLYMERE DE NORBORNENE

Publication

EP 0931816 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97944102 A

Priority

  • JP 9703651 W
  • JP 28768896 A
  • JP 21806697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0931816A1] A norbornene resin composition comprising 100 parts by weight of a thermoplastic norbornene polymer and 1 to 150 parts by weight of a thermosetting resin.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08L 65/00; C08L 63/00; C08L 79/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08G 61/04 (2006.01); C08L 63/00 (2006.01); C08L 65/00 (2006.01); C08L 79/08 (2006.01); H05K 1/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08L 63/00 (2013.01); C08G 61/04 (2013.01); C08L 65/00 (2013.01); C08L 79/08 (2013.01); H05K 1/032 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C08L 63/00 + C08L 2666/22
  2. C08L 65/00 + C08L 2666/08
  3. C08L 65/00 + C08L 79/08
  4. C08L 65/00 + C08L 2666/22
  5. C08L 79/08 + C08L 2666/22
  6. C08L 79/08 + C08L 2666/16

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FI FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0931816 A1 19990728; EP 0931816 A4 20000809; EP 0931816 B1 20050413; DE 69733022 D1 20050519; DE 69733022 T2 20060216; JP 4267073 B2 20090527; KR 100506381 B1 20050805; KR 20000048957 A 20000725; US 6492443 B1 20021210; WO 9815595 A1 19980416

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69733022

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101006

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050413

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2006-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20051009

2006-06-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2006-04-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060116

2005-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-10-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051009

2005-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69733022

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-05-19

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-04-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI FR GB LI

2005-04-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2005-04-13 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050413

2005-04-13 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050413

2005-04-13 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050413

2003-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030509

2000-08-09 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000626

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI FR GB LI

2000-04-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 08L 65/00 A, 7C 08L 63/00 B, 7C 08L 79/08 B

1999-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990426

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI FR GB LI