Global Patent Index - EP 0931863 B1

EP 0931863 B1 2002-09-18 - Spinning pack for the spinning of continuous filaments

Title (en)

Spinning pack for the spinning of continuous filaments

Title (de)

Düsenpaket zum Spinnen von Endlosfäden

Title (fr)

Ensemble de filage pour le filage de filaments continus

Publication

EP 0931863 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98122845 A

Priority

  • CH 185393 A
  • EP 94917539 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5662947A] PCT No. PCT/CH94/00123 Sec. 371 Date Apr. 5, 1995 Sec. 102(e) Date Apr. 5, 1995 PCT Filed Jun. 20, 1994 PCT Pub. No. WO95/00684 PCT Pub. Date Jan. 5, 1995A nozzle package is connected at its lower end to a heating box by means of elements which permit a good heat transfer to the nozzle plate included in the nozzle package.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01D 4/00; D01D 4/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01D 4/00 (2006.01); D01D 4/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01D 4/08 (2013.01); D01D 4/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

US 5662947 A 19970902; AT 182929 T 19990815; AT 224469 T 20021015; BR 9405424 A 19990908; CH 688044 A5 19970430; CN 1056202 C 20000906; CN 1095884 C 20021211; CN 1111062 A 19951101; CN 1258766 A 20000705; CZ 285244 B6 19990616; CZ 9500402 A3 19961113; DE 59408582 D1 19990909; DE 59410185 D1 20021024; EP 0663024 A1 19950719; EP 0663024 B1 19990804; EP 0931863 A2 19990728; EP 0931863 A3 19991006; EP 0931863 B1 20020918; ES 2137370 T3 19991216; JP 2004339686 A 20041202; JP 2006037338 A 20060209; JP 2006225845 A 20060831; JP 3776450 B2 20060517; JP 3828558 B2 20061004; JP 3908774 B2 20070425; JP H08500650 A 19960123; TW 263535 B 19951121; WO 9500684 A1 19950105

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070620

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *RIETER AUTOMATIK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070101

2007-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070101

2006-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-06-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060616

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-06-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050628

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-06-23 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050623

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-06-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050621

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-02-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 0931863E

2003-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030620

2003-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-03-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59410185 20021024

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-18 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 663024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224469 T 20021015

2001-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010125

1999-10-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990625

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL

1999-09-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6D 01D 4/00 A, 6D 01D 4/08 B

1999-07-28 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 663024

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL