Global Patent Index - EP 0931868 A3

EP 0931868 A3 2000-05-17 - Spreading device for textile fabrics

Title (en)

Spreading device for textile fabrics

Title (de)

Breitstreckaggregat für textile Warenbahnen

Title (fr)

Dispositif élargisseur pour étoffes textiles

Publication

EP 0931868 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98121429 A

Priority

DE 19802521 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19802521C1] The textile fabric spreader, with an assembly of needle discs (100), has an axis shaft (40) through the needle disc assembly (100). The shaft (40) acts as a common rotary axis for the needle discs (20) and also for the support drum (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06C 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 20/20 (2006.01); B65H 23/025 (2006.01); D06C 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06C 3/062 (2013.01); B65H 20/20 (2013.01); B65H 23/0253 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[DA] DE 19520513 C1 19960725 - KUESTERS ZITTAUER MASCHF GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19802521 C1 19990218; AT 231575 T 20030215; EP 0931868 A2 19990728; EP 0931868 A3 20000517; EP 0931868 B1 20030122

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071111

2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051130

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-06-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031111

2004-01-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031023

2003-12-12 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031111

2003-11-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031111

2003-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-02-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807002 P 20030227

2003-02-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030122

2003-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2003-01-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-22 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030122

2003-01-22 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030122

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020619

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1999-07-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI