Global Patent Index - EP 0931876 A3

EP 0931876 A3 2001-01-10 - Press section

Title (en)

Press section

Title (de)

Pressenpartie

Title (fr)

Section de pressage

Publication

EP 0931876 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98121472 A

Priority

DE 19802054 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2259809A1] Press section and method of using the same for drainage of a fibrous material we b that includes a shoe press roll, a cylindrical counter roll, at least one nip, a first nip of the at least one nip formed by the shoe press roll and the cylindrical counter roll and at least one press felt. The at least one press felt is disposed on each side of the fibr ous material web. The at least one press felt travels through a last nip of the at least one nip where the at least one press felt is separated from the fibrous material web and conveyed away after leaving the last nip. The drainage capacity and the reliable guidance of the fib rous material web are improved.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/02 (2006.01); D21F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/045 (2013.01); D21F 3/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19802054 A1 19990722; CA 2259809 A1 19990721; EP 0931876 A2 19990728; EP 0931876 A3 20010110; EP 0931876 B1 20040218; US 2001009181 A1 20010726; US 6325894 B1 20011204; US 6361658 B2 20020326

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-02-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041119

2004-05-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040518

2004-03-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810792 P 20040325

2004-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2004-02-18 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040218

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI SE

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010710

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

1999-07-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI