Global Patent Index - EP 0931888 A3

EP 0931888 A3 2000-04-05 - Partition element

Title (en)

Partition element

Title (de)

Wandelement

Title (fr)

Elément de cloison

Publication

EP 0931888 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99100852 A

Priority

  • DE 19802032 A
  • DE 19811537 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0931888A2] At least one rechargeable energy source is used to power the drive mechanism for the carriage(s) (12) used to move the wall panels (11) along the rail (19). At least one of the carriages is linked to a drive mechanism and the top end of each wall panel is joined to at least one (preferably two) carriages.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/82; E05F 15/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/82 (2006.01); E05F 15/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/827 (2013.01); E05F 15/638 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/404 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/434 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/674 (2013.01); E05Y 2400/614 (2013.01); E05Y 2400/658 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/46 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/12 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/22 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/748 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/142 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0931888 A2 19990728; EP 0931888 A3 20000405

INPADOC legal status


2001-09-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-08-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001006

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04B 2/82 A, 7E 05F 15/14 B

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-07-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI