Global patent index - EP 0931893 A3

EP 0931893 A3 2000-02-02 - Process for making floors of stone and floors of stony materials

Title (en)

Process for making floors of stone and floors of stony materials

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Steinfussböden und Fussböden aus steinartigem Material

Title (fr)

Procédé de production de planchers en pierre et planchers en matériaux pierreux

Publication

EP 0931893 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99100680 A

Priority

DE 19801686 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0931893A2] A process for producing stone type floor surfaces using stone type material plates joined by an epoxy resin, comprises applying a separating agent to the plate surface. The epoxy resin is then applied over the whole floor surface. The resin fills the gaps between the plates and forms a thin film over the floor surface. The surface is then ground with grinding tools.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 15/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 15/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 15/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0931893 A2 19990728; EP 0931893 A3 20000202; DE 19801686 A1 19990729; DE 19801686 C2 20000713

INPADOC legal status

2004-02-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030313

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000728

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-07-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI