Global Patent Index - EP 0931901 A3

EP 0931901 A3 2000-07-26 - A frame construction such as a window frame, a facade construction or the like

Title (en)

A frame construction such as a window frame, a facade construction or the like

Title (de)

Rahmenstruktur, sowie ein Fensterrahmen, eine Fassadenstruktur oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Structure de cadre, p.ex. cadre de fenêtre, structure de façade ou similaire

Publication

EP 0931901 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99610004 A

Priority

DK 3698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0931901A2] A frame structure, such as a window frame, a front structure or the like, composed of lengths of profiles comprises an outer frame intended to be fixed to a building. The outer frame is divided by mullions (10) and transoms (11) into sections in which sheet-shaped elements, typically glass panes, may be mounted. At least some of the transoms (11) and optionally also some of the mullions (10) are fixed in the frame in that they are provided with at least one, preferably two clamping means, typically in the form of rods or wires (2,3), extending therethrough. This provides a frame structure which is simple to construct, and which exhibits a substantially increased static strength because of the superposed stresses in the transoms as a consequence of the fixing. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/68; E04B 2/96; E06B 3/99

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/68 (2006.01); E06B 3/964 (2006.01); E06B 3/99 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/9649 (2013.01); E06B 3/68 (2013.01); E06B 3/99 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0931901 A2 19990728; EP 0931901 A3 20000726; EP 0931901 B1 20050420; DE 69924768 D1 20050525; DE 69924768 T2 20060309; DK 0931901 T3 20050523

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160112

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160106

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160112

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160105

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-10-18 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2006-04-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060123

2006-01-12 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060112

2005-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2005-08-02 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2005-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69924768

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-05-25

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-05-23 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2005-05-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2005-04-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK GB IE NL SE

2005-04-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2005-04-20 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050420

2005-04-20 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050420

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031001

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE DK GB IE NL SE

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010124

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK GB IE NL SE

1999-07-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI