Global Patent Index - EP 0931903 A3

EP 0931903 A3 2000-12-20 - Cord lock

Title (en)

Cord lock

Title (de)

Schnurklemme

Title (fr)

Dispositif de blocage de corde

Publication

EP 0931903 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99300180 A

Priority

  • EP 99300180 A
  • EP 98200075 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0931903A2] A cord lock (2) for fitment to the end of a head rail (1) of a blind, the cord lock including a base element (3), a cap structure (5) on the base element (3) and together with the base element (3) defining therebetween a cord inlet, a cord outlet and a cord passage extending therebetween, a cord guide surface (27,29) formed in the base element (3) and extending inwardly of the cord lock (2) from the cord outlet, a locking roller (7) and roller guide walls formed in the cap structure defining a path along which the locking roller (7) may move, the path being adjacent to and inclined with the cord guide surface (27,29) such that the roller (7) moves closer to the cord guide surface (27,29) whilst moving away from the cord outlet, wherein with the cord lock (2) oriented in use such that the roller (7) moves under gravity away from the cord guide surface (27,29), movement of a cord inwardly from the cord outlet along the cord guide surface (27,29) will cause the roller (7) to move towards the cord guide surface (27,29) and pinch the cord therebetween. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/324

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/324 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/324 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0931903 A2 19990728; EP 0931903 A3 20001220

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040420

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031208

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010207

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1999-07-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI