Global Patent Index - EP 0931905 A3

EP 0931905 A3 2000-05-17 - Accessory for ladders

Title (en)

Accessory for ladders

Title (de)

Anbauteil für Leitern

Title (fr)

Accessoires pour échelles

Publication

EP 0931905 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98123362 A

Priority

AT 11698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0931905A2] The basic frame (2) of a top (10) and bottom (9) rail is suspended from two rungs (1a) of the ladder (1) which are joined by two lengthwise struts which have insertion-eyelets. An implement-holder (5) and or a security apparatus against falling backwards (4) have insertion-pieces which fit into the eyelets of one or the other lengthwise strut of the base frame. The bottom rail is fixed to the rung by a screw (11) or clamp. The top rail is joined to the lengthwise strut by a platform (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06C 7/16; E06C 7/14; E06C 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06C 7/14 (2006.01); E06C 7/16 (2006.01); E06C 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06C 7/14 (2013.01); E06C 7/16 (2013.01); E06C 7/185 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0931905 A2 19990728; EP 0931905 A3 20000517; AT 406179 B 20000327; AT A11698 A 19990715

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020702

2001-03-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH FR GB IT LI SE

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001116

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH FR GB IT LI SE

1999-07-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI