Global Patent Index - EP 0931913 B1

EP 0931913 B1 2002-11-06 - Exhaust silencer for internal combustion engines

Title (en)

Exhaust silencer for internal combustion engines

Title (de)

Abgasschalldämpfer für Verbrennungsmotoren

Title (fr)

Silencieux d'échappement pour moteurs à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0931913 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99100291 A

Priority

DE 19802624 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0931913A1] Exhaust gas flows via the inlet pipe (12) into exhaust the inlet chamber (22) , in which the gas is deflected to flow centrally through the catalyst body (10) to a downstream chamber (23) at the opposite end face of the catalyst body, through which the end piece of the inlet pipe passes. Preferably the outlet chamber communicates with a resonator chamber (24).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 3/28; F01N 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/28 (2006.01); F01N 1/02 (2006.01); F01N 1/06 (2006.01); F01N 1/24 (2006.01); F01N 13/02 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/2885 (2013.01); F01N 13/0097 (2014.06); F01N 1/02 (2013.01); F01N 1/06 (2013.01); F01N 1/24 (2013.01); F01N 2210/00 (2013.01); F01N 2210/02 (2013.01); F01N 2230/04 (2013.01); F01N 2350/04 (2013.01); F01N 2470/18 (2013.01); F01N 2470/30 (2013.01); F01N 2490/155 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0931913 A1 19990728; EP 0931913 B1 20021106; AT 227392 T 20021115; DE 19802624 A1 19990729

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090131

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-01-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050109

2004-10-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-01-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040109

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-05-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030120

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-01-10 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030110

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903280 20021212

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

2002-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227392 T 20021115

2002-07-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: J. EBERSPAECHER GMBH & CO. KG

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010322

2000-04-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR IT

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991223

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

1999-07-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI