Global Patent Index - EP 0931925 A3

EP 0931925 A3 2000-03-15 - Liquid cooled cylinder head for a multi-cylinder , multi-valve internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Liquid cooled cylinder head for a multi-cylinder , multi-valve internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Flüssigkeitsgekühlter Zylinderkopf einer mehrzylindrigen, je Zylinder mehrventiligen Brennkraftmschine

Title (fr)

Culasse refroidie par liquide pour un moteur à combustion interne, à plusieurs cylindres et plusieurs soupapes par cylindre

Publication

EP 0931925 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98123345 A

Priority

DE 19802060 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0931925A2] The water-cooled motor cylinder head (1), with multiple valves at each cylinder of the internal combustion motor, has at least one longitudinal channel (13) defined by a flat angled section (2') of an outer wall (2) inwards towards the longitudinal center plane of the cylinder head. It is also defined by an adjacent cylinder head base section (3') and a longitudinal wall (14) linking it to the outer wall section (2'). The gas exchange collection channel (9), through the longitudinal wall (14), has passage openings (15,16) above and below the channel (9). The lower passage opening (16) at the cylinder head base side, has a cross section according to the gap from a single coolant feed of the longitudinal channel (13), and is linked to guide ribs (18,18') at a free valve web zone (17) between identical dedicated gas exchange channels (10,10') and oriented at them. The gas exchange channels (10,10') form a coolant passage (19,19') with the gas exchange channels (10,10 ') at their base sides. The upper passage (15) acts as the coolant effect section as a valve guide (20,20') between the gas exchange channels (10,10') and the cover wall (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 1/40; F02F 1/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/40 (2006.01); F02F 1/42 (2006.01); F02F 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/4214 (2013.01); F02F 1/40 (2013.01); F02F 2001/245 (2013.01); F02F 2001/246 (2013.01); F02F 2001/247 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19802060 A1 19990722; EP 0931925 A2 19990728; EP 0931925 A3 20000315; EP 0931925 B1 20031105; ES 2210649 T3 20040701

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59810082

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-10-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-07-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2210649 T3

2003-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810082 P 20031211

2003-11-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-11-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000824

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 02F 1/40 A, 7F 02F 1/42 B

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-07-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI