Global Patent Index - EP 0931939 A3

EP 0931939 A3 2000-08-30 - Vacuum pump

Title (en)

Vacuum pump

Title (de)

Vakuumpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à vide

Publication

EP 0931939 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98111113 A

Priority

IT TO971139 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0931939A2] The invention concerns a vacuum pump (1) for achieving high vacuum conditions comprising a pump casing (5), a first plurality of molecular pumping stages (2) formed by rotor disks (8a,8b) cooperating with stator rings (9a,9b) and housed in a first portion (4a) of said pump casing, and a second plurality of pumping diaphragm stages (3) housed in a second portion (4b) of said pump casing, a first electric motor (13) for driving said rotor disks of the molecular stages, a second electric motor (30) for actuating the diaphragms (40) of the diaphragm stages, and at least a common passage (7) for the passage of the gas discharged from said molecular pumping stages (2) and sucked by said diaphragm pumping stages (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 19/04; F04B 27/053; F04B 37/14; F04B 45/047; F04D 25/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 27/053 (2006.01); F04B 45/047 (2006.01); F04D 19/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 45/047 (2013.01); F04B 27/053 (2013.01); F04D 19/046 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0931939 A2 19990728; EP 0931939 A3 20000830; EP 0931939 B1 20030625; DE 69815806 D1 20030731; DE 69815806 T2 20040519; HK 1021401 A1 20031010; IT 1297347 B1 19990901; IT TO971139 A1 19990624

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090617

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090617

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090617

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080627

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080617

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080731

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080626

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69815806 P 20030731

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001012

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 04D 19/04 A, 7F 04D 25/16 B, 7F 04B 45/047 B, 7F 04B 37/14 B, 7F 04B 27/053 B

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-07-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI