Global Patent Index - EP 0931939 B1

EP 0931939 B1 2003-06-25 - Vacuum pump

Title (en)

Vacuum pump

Title (de)

Vakuumpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à vide

Publication

EP 0931939 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98111113 A

Priority

IT TO971139 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0931939A2] The invention concerns a vacuum pump (1) for achieving high vacuum conditions comprising a pump casing (5), a first plurality of molecular pumping stages (2) formed by rotor disks (8a,8b) cooperating with stator rings (9a,9b) and housed in a first portion (4a) of said pump casing, and a second plurality of pumping diaphragm stages (3) housed in a second portion (4b) of said pump casing, a first electric motor (13) for driving said rotor disks of the molecular stages, a second electric motor (30) for actuating the diaphragms (40) of the diaphragm stages, and at least a common passage (7) for the passage of the gas discharged from said molecular pumping stages (2) and sucked by said diaphragm pumping stages (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 19/04; F04B 27/053; F04B 37/14; F04B 45/047; F04D 25/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 27/053 (2006.01); F04B 45/047 (2006.01); F04D 19/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 45/047 (2013.01); F04B 27/053 (2013.01); F04D 19/046 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0931939 A2 19990728; EP 0931939 A3 20000830; EP 0931939 B1 20030625; DE 69815806 D1 20030731; DE 69815806 T2 20040519; HK 1021401 A1 20031010; IT 1297347 B1 19990901; IT TO971139 A1 19990624

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090617

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090617

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090617

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080627

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080617

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080731

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080626

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69815806 P 20030731

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001012

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 04D 19/04 A, 7F 04D 25/16 B, 7F 04B 45/047 B, 7F 04B 37/14 B, 7F 04B 27/053 B

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-07-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI