Global Patent Index - EP 0932009 A3

EP 0932009 A3 2000-07-05 - Heat exchanger for fuel-heated water heater, more particularly for condensing boiler

Title (en)

Heat exchanger for fuel-heated water heater, more particularly for condensing boiler

Title (de)

Wärmeübertrager für brennstoffbeheizte Wassererhitzer, insbesondere für Brennwertgeräte

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur pour chauffe-eau chauffé par un combustible, en particulier pour chaudière à condensation

Publication

EP 0932009 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98120353 A

Priority

DE 29800981 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0932009A2] The heat transmitter has an inner pipe (10) provided on the outside and/or the inside with longitudinal rib (14,16). The inner pipe has several wall sections distributed over its periphery and extending inwards and/or outwards, and has a linear-symmetrical profile.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 1/02; F28D 7/10; F28F 1/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 7/10 (2006.01); F28F 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 7/106 (2013.01); F28F 1/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29800981 U1 19990520; EP 0932009 A2 19990728; EP 0932009 A3 20000705

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010108

2001-04-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-07-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI