Global Patent Index - EP 0932010 A3

EP 0932010 A3 2000-07-12 - Side piece for heat exchanger

Title (en)

Side piece for heat exchanger

Title (de)

Seitenteil für einen Wärmeübertrager

Title (fr)

Joue latérale pour échangeur de chaleur

Publication

EP 0932010 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99100340 A

Priority

DE 19802278 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0932010A2] The side parts (1) engage over the outer ends (3a) of the ribs (3) U-fashion and are held by counter hooks as securing components in aligned recesses (4) of the ribs. The rib (7) on the side parts is arched convexly to the ribs (3) and in the installed state locates on the ribs under tension. The rib at both ends is provided with protruding side walls (8) and is formed into a hollow profile by a second rib (9) connecting the side walls. Between the two ribs (7,9) at least one connecting component (11,14) is provided and fixes the distance between them.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 9/001 (2013.01); F28F 9/002 (2013.01); F28F 2275/085 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0932010 A2 19990728; EP 0932010 A3 20000712; EP 0932010 B1 20030416; DE 19802278 A1 19990729

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070113

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060110

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070113

2007-11-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070930

2007-09-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070113

2007-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070801

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-01-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060123

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-01-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060120

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040119

2004-01-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030520

2003-05-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905017 P 20030522

2003-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-04-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: HEAT EXCHANGER

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020315

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-07-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI