Global Patent Index - EP 0932012 A3

EP 0932012 A3 2000-11-22 - Loading system for an artillery gun

Title (en)

Loading system for an artillery gun

Title (de)

Ladevorrichtung für ein Geschütz

Title (fr)

Dispositif de chargement pour canon d'artillerie

Publication

EP 0932012 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99850004 A

Priority

SE 9800207 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0932012A2] The present invention relates to a piece-mounted shell magazine (7) of the endless chain conveyor type intended for preferably self-propelled artillery pieces (1), which magazine, as a result of its design and the fact that it is mounted on the elevating system (4) of the piece, is capable in an effective manner of having in readiness a sufficient firsthand requirement of shells (24) which may be of different types and are all promptly available for firing in any order. The shell magazine (7) according to the invention is also very suitable for modernizing older pieces. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 9/76; F41A 9/39; F41A 9/82

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 9/37 (2006.01); F41A 9/76 (2006.01); F41A 9/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 9/375 (2013.01); F41A 9/76 (2013.01); F41A 9/82 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0932012 A2 19990728; EP 0932012 A3 20001122; EP 0932012 B1 20031217; DE 69913576 D1 20040129; DE 69913576 T2 20040916; SE 508923 C2 19981116; SE 9800207 D0 19980127; SE 9800207 L 19981116

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160201

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160115

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160802

2016-10-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160930

2016-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160115

2016-08-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69913576

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150119

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150127

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150128

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-12-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-07-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69913576 P 20040129

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2003-12-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-09-26 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB SE

2001-08-01 [D17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (DELETED)

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010523

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

1999-07-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI