Global Patent Index - EP 0932013 A3

EP 0932013 A3 2000-11-15 - Improved gas bottle and air gun

Title (en)

Improved gas bottle and air gun

Title (de)

Druckgaspatrone und Gasdruckwaffe

Title (fr)

Cartouche de gaz et arme à gaz comprimé

Publication

EP 0932013 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99300316 A

Priority

  • GB 9801296 A
  • GB 9809396 A
  • GB 9815565 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0932013A2] A re-pressurisable gas reservoir for a gas powered pistol, rifle or other gun having a known piercing pin provided for piercing a known sealed carbon dioxide cartridge in its reduced diameter end, or narrow neck or such reservoir whenever used in such a gun, characterised by the feature that the reservoir comprises a re-pressurisable gas bottle or cartridge with a reduced diameter end or narrow neck and which is re-pressurisable by air, and said bottle or cartridge having an opening in its narrow end or neck provided for receiving the cartridge piercing pin of the gun with said opening communicating with an inlet/outlet passage in which a valve is located and said valve is such as to be openable by said pin to enable pressurisation of the gun.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41B 11/06; F41B 11/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41B 11/62 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41B 11/62 (2013.01); F17C 2270/0736 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0932013 A2 19990728; EP 0932013 A3 20001115; GB 2333583 A 19990728

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010801

2001-09-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-07-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI