Global Patent Index - EP 0932129 B1

EP 0932129 B1 2003-06-11 - Improvements in and relating to a machine for dispensing media

Title (en)

Improvements in and relating to a machine for dispensing media

Title (de)

Verbesserungen an einer Zahlungsmittelausgabevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Améliorations à une machine distributrice de supports de données

Publication

EP 0932129 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98310393 A

Priority

GB 9726836 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0932129A2] This invention relates to a machine 10, such as a card operated self service terminal (SST) capable of dispensing media such as tickets or receipts, or prepaid cards; the SST may be an ATM which dispenses banknotes. The machine (10) comprises a user interface means (16) and a media transporter (T) for transporting media from a media dispensing point (29) along a media path (P) to a media presentation point. The media transporter (T) comprises a variable length belt feed means (40) which is adjustable between a first retracted position in which the media presentation point is adjacent the media dispensing point (29) and a second protracted position in which the media presentation point is displaced from the media dispensing point (29). <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 19/00; G07D 9/00; G07D 11/00; G07F 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/12 (2006.01); B65H 29/60 (2006.01); G07D 11/00 (2006.01); G07F 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 19/20 (2013.01); B65H 29/12 (2013.01); G07D 11/0018 (2013.01); G07F 19/201 (2013.01); G07F 19/202 (2013.01); B65H 2404/2613 (2013.01); B65H 2408/13 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0932129 A2 19990728; EP 0932129 A3 20001206; EP 0932129 B1 20030611; DE 69815487 D1 20030717; DE 69815487 T2 20040519; ES 2200278 T3 20040301; GB 9726836 D0 19980218; JP 4394189 B2 20100106; JP H11240655 A 19990907; ZA 9811534 B 20000615

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171229

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180102

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171227

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171227

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-12-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151217

2017-08-31 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20170710

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151217

2016-12-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-12-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-12-02 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20091111

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-03-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2200278 T3

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69815487 P 20030717

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020318

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010606

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 07F 19/00 A, 7G 07D 11/00 B, 7G 07F 7/10 B, 7G 07D 9/00 B

1999-10-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SWINTON, JAMES D.

1999-10-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RICE, WILLIAM

1999-10-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MCMILLAN, DAVID J.

1999-10-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WIGGINS, TIMOTHY

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-07-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI