Global Patent Index - EP 0932135 A3

EP 0932135 A3 2000-07-19 - Security device

Title (en)

Security device

Title (de)

Sicherheitsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de securité

Publication

EP 0932135 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99100009 A

Priority

AU PP143998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0932135A2] A security device for forming a ring or shackle seal. The device includes a housing (14) at one end of a band (10) into which a male element (12) at the other end of the band is insertable. The housing has opposing laterally offset teeth (28) integrally formed therein for interlocking with complementary recesses (54, 56) in opposite faces of the male element to prevent withdrawal of the male element from the housing. The housing includes only the one entrance (16) for receiving the male element which element may include blocking means (60, 62) for occupying the opening into the housing. The device confers improved security in that the teeth are inaccessible for pre-tampering prior to the seal being formed and once formed, access into the housing is inhibited by the blocking means. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 3/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/0352 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0932135 A2 19990728; EP 0932135 A3 20000719; AU PP143998 A0 19980212

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060531

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991106

1999-08-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WRIGLEY, ANDREW NICHOLSON

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1999-07-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI