Global patent index - EP 0932219 A3

EP 0932219 A3 2001-03-07 - Planar antenna

Title (en)

Planar antenna

Title (de)

Planare Antenne

Title (fr)

Antenne plane

Publication

EP 0932219 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99660009 A

Priority

FI 980131 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0932219A2] An antenna for transmitting and receiving a radio frequency signal comprises a planar radiator (801, 901), a ground plane substantially parallel to the radiator, and a feed point (402, 602, 1106). Further it comprises a separate connector part (404, 604, 1105) for forming an electrical connection between the radiator and the feed point, and means (408, 1101, 1201, 1202) for the mechanical support of the edges of the planar radiator. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 9/04; H01Q 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 9/0421 (2013.01); H01Q 1/243 (2013.01); H01Q 9/045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0932219 A2 19990728; EP 0932219 A3 20010307; FI 113213 B 20040315; FI 980131 A0 19980121; FI 980131 A 19990722

INPADOC legal status

2008-02-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20070801

2005-10-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LK PRODUCTS OY

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB SE

2001-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010827

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FILTRONIC LK OY

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

1999-07-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI