Global Patent Index - EP 0932326 A3

EP 0932326 A3 2000-03-22 - Radiant electric heater

Title (en)

Radiant electric heater

Title (de)

Elektriscer Strahlungsheizkörper

Title (fr)

Elément de chauffage électrique rayonnant

Publication

EP 0932326 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99300056 A

Priority

GB 9801241 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0932326A2] A radiant electric heater comprises a dish-like support (1) containing a base layer (2) of thermal and electrical insulation material and having supported therein one or more radiant electric heating elements (3). A metal grid or mesh (6) overlies the base layer and is spaced from the one or more heating elements, and at least one spacer (7) is provided inside the dish-like support and cooperating with the metal grid or mesh. The at least one spacer (7) is engaged in the base layer (2) of insulation material and extends between the metal grid or mesh (6) and the dish-like support (1) and/or the base layer (2) of insulation material. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 3/74; F24C 15/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/72 (2013.01); H05B 2203/032 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0932326 A2 19990728; EP 0932326 A3 20000322; GB 2333679 A 19990728; GB 2333679 B 20020213; GB 9801241 D0 19980318

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050120

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000624

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 05B 3/74 A, 7F 24C 15/10 B

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

1999-07-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI