Global Patent Index - EP 0932350 B1

EP 0932350 B1 2002-09-18 - MULTIPURPOSE LECTERN

Title (en)

MULTIPURPOSE LECTERN

Title (de)

UNIVERSELLES LESEPULT

Title (fr)

LUTRIN UNIVERSEL

Publication

EP 0932350 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98937602 A

Priority

  • FR 9801493 W
  • FR 9708966 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2766069A1] The invention concerns an improved lectern for presenting bound books, consisting in a device for receiving the open book with maximum security for its cover and optimal reading comfort. It consists of two plates (1) with a ledge (2) fixed by clamps (3) to pivoting pins (4). Said pins (4) are fixed on a crosspiece (5) whereof the upper profile constitutes a stop for the inclination (6) of the plates and houses springs (7) balancing said plates, a device (C) for extending the crosspiece (5). Said crosspiece (5) is fixed to lateral legs (8) by a system such as, for example, perforations and bolts (9) for varying the lectern inclination from a horizontal plane to a quasi-vertical plane. The legs (8) comprise recesses (10) for receiving a mobile crosspiece (11) or console (12), fixed on either a central (13) or lateral (14) column. In the latter case, the height is adjusted by means of a rack (15) or a clamp assembly (16). To ensure a proper limit stop for the edge (0) of the book pages on the plate ledge (2), the usual slight extra width of the cover (17) is compensated by mobile inserts (18) maintained above said extra width (17) by a fold-up forming a corner angle piece.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 23/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 19/06 (2006.01); A47B 23/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 23/042 (2013.01); A47B 19/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

FR 2766069 A1 19990122; FR 2766069 B1 19991008; CA 2266127 A1 19990128; DE 69808039 D1 20021024; DE 69808039 T2 20030515; EP 0932350 A1 19990804; EP 0932350 B1 20020918; WO 9903374 A1 19990128

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-02-26 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081022

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-05-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: LE BREVET A ETE REACTIVE SELON LA DEMANDE DE POURSUITE DE LA PROCEDURE DU 29.04.2005.

2005-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040728

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-28 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: LE BREVET A ETE REACTIVE SELON LA DEMANDE DE POURSUITE DE LA PROCEDURE DU 26.04.2004

2004-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MATZDORFF WERNER

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-03-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69808039 20021024

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020122

1999-08-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990308

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI