Global Patent Index - EP 0932406 A4

EP 0932406 A4 2000-07-05 - METHODS OF TREATING OR PREVENTING INTERSTITIAL CYSTITIS

Title (en)

METHODS OF TREATING OR PREVENTING INTERSTITIAL CYSTITIS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG ODER VORBEUGUNG DER INTERSTITIELLEN BLASENENTZÜNDUNG

Title (fr)

METHODES DE TRAITEMENT OU DE PREVENTION DE LA CYSTITE INTERSTITIELLE

Publication

EP 0932406 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97908927 A

Priority

  • US 9703555 W
  • US 1313096 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9733583A1] This invention provides methods for the treatment or prevention of interstitial cystitis or urethral syndrome in a mammal which comprise administering to a mammal in need thereof an effective amount of a compound of formula (I), where R<1> and R<2> are independently selected from the group consisting of hydrogen, methyl, methoxy, chloro, and trifluoromethyl, with the proviso that no more than one of R<1> and R<2> can be hydrogen; and Y is (1), (2), (3), (4), (5), (6), N-R<a>, or CH-NR<b>R<c>, where R<a>, R<b>, and R<c> are independently selected from the group consisting of hydrogen and C1-C6 alkyl; or a pharmaceutically acceptable salt or solvate thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/445; C07D 401/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 401/12 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/4427 (2006.01); A61K 31/445 (2006.01); A61K 31/4465 (2006.01); A61K 31/4523 (2006.01); A61K 31/454 (2006.01); A61K 31/4545 (2006.01); A61K 31/495 (2006.01); A61K 31/496 (2006.01); A61P 13/00 (2006.01); A61P 13/02 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 209/14 (2006.01); C07D 209/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 209/16 (2013.01); A61K 31/454 (2013.01); A61K 31/4545 (2013.01); A61K 31/496 (2013.01); C07D 209/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 9733583A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9733583 A1 19970918; AU 2071497 A 19971001; CA 2247822 A1 19970918; EP 0932406 A1 19990804; EP 0932406 A4 20000705; JP 2000506527 A 20000530

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021001

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030220

2000-07-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61K 31/445 A, 7C 07D 401/14 B, 7A 61K 31/495 B

2000-07-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1999-08-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980909

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE