Global patent index - EP 0932432 B1

EP 0932432 B1 2000-05-31 - LABILE BROMINE FIRE SUPPRESSANTS

Title (en)

LABILE BROMINE FIRE SUPPRESSANTS

Title (de)

LABILES BROM ENTHALTENDE FEUERLÖSCHSUBSTANZ

Title (fr)

AGENTS EXTINCTEURS CONTENANT DU BROME LABILE

Publication

EP 0932432 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96936260 A

Priority

US 9616089 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9815322A1] A class of fire suppressant compounds which have labile bromine atoms bound to atoms other than carbon have been discovered to be more effective at suppressing fires than Halon 1211 and Halon 1301. Moreover, this class of fire suppressant compounds hydrolyze or oxidize rapidly in the troposphere and as a consequence thereof, they have minimal ozone depletion potential.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62D 1/06 (2006.01); A62D 1/00 (2006.01); C09K 21/02 (2006.01); C09K 21/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62D 1/0028 (2013.01); A62D 1/00 (2013.01); A62D 1/0007 (2013.01); A62D 1/0092 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9815322 A1 19980416; AU 7395296 A 19980505; DE 69608707 D1 20000706; DE 69608707 T2 20001123; EP 0932432 A1 19990804; EP 0932432 B1 20000531; JP 2001501523 A 20010206; JP 3868500 B2 20070117

INPADOC legal status

2016-11-02 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20161007

2016-10-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2016-10-12 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK

- Effective date: 20161007

2016-10-08 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69608707

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151009

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151007

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151030

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-09-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-07-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLBEINSTRASSE 36-38, 4051 BASEL (CH)

2011-03-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: ECLIPSE AEROSPACE INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECH

- Effective date: 20110330

2010-12-24 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2010-12-22 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: SD

- Effective date: 20101124

2010-12-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ECLIPSE AEROSPACE, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2010-12-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ECLIPSE AVIATION CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2010-07-07 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20100610 AND 20100616

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: PHYRX, LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2007-07-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-09-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69608707

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-06

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHYRX, LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990817

1999-08-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990317

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB LI NL