Global Patent Index - EP 0932553 B1

EP 0932553 B1 2000-07-12 - TRAY-SHAPED PAPER CONTAINERS, IN PARTICULAR FOR FOODSTUFFS TO BE BAKED

Title (en)

TRAY-SHAPED PAPER CONTAINERS, IN PARTICULAR FOR FOODSTUFFS TO BE BAKED

Title (de)

SCHALENFÖRMIGER BEHÄLTER AUS PAPIER, INSBESONDERE FÜR ZUM BACKEN BESTIMMTE NAHRÜNGSMITTEL

Title (fr)

RECIPIENTS EN PAPIER EN FORME DE BARQUETTE, EN PARTICULIER POUR ALIMENTS A CUIRE AU FOUR

Publication

EP 0932553 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97945089 A

Priority

  • IT 9700243 W
  • IT MI960697 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9817539A1] A tray-shaped paper container is provided, in particular for foodstuffs to be baked, which comprises a flat bottom, side walls having upper borders of substantially flat conformation and substantially flat stiffening means applied to the region of said upper borders.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 5/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/448 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9817539 A1 19980430; BR 9712293 A 20000125; DE 69702534 D1 20000817; DE 69702534 T2 20010613; EP 0932553 A1 19990804; EP 0932553 B1 20000712; ES 2150281 T3 20001116; IL 128719 A 20040328; IL 128719 D0 20000131; IT 240960 Y1 20010420; IT MI960697 U1 19980420; IT MI960697 V0 19961018

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170102

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161125

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161031

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161028

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150281 T3

2000-11-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2000-09-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69702534 20000817

2000-07-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991215

1999-08-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990219

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE