Global Patent Index - EP 0932578 A4

EP 0932578 A4 2000-03-08 - MACHINE FOR DISPENSING A SOFT-SERVE PRODUCT

Title (en)

MACHINE FOR DISPENSING A SOFT-SERVE PRODUCT

Title (de)

MASCHINE ZUM AUSGEBEN VON SOFTEIS

Title (fr)

DISTRIBUTEUR DE PRODUITS GLACES MOUS

Publication

EP 0932578 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97931474 A

Priority

  • US 9711274 W
  • ZA 9605613 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9800360A1] A machine for dispensing a soft-serve product comprises a freezer barrel (12), a mix hopper (14) for containing soft-serve mix (16) and being in flow communication with the freezer barrel so that soft-serve mix can flow from the mix hopper into the freezer barrell a flow passage (42, 42.1) leading from the freezer barrel to a draw spout (64), and a beater assembly (20) for expelling frozen product from the freezer barrel via the flow passage to the draw spout. A solids hopper (52) for containing a flowable solid topping is further provided, and an archimedes screw (56) for feeding the solid topping from the solids hopper into the flow stream of soft-serve product as it passes through the flow passage. A vaned rotor (44) and a rotation sensor (80) meter the flow of soft-serve product through the flow passage and control the speed of a topping motor (60) driving the archimedes screw.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67D 5/08; A23G 9/28; G01F 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23G 9/04 (2006.01); A23G 9/16 (2006.01); A23G 9/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A23G 9/283 (2013.01); A23G 9/163 (2013.01); A23G 9/281 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9800360 A1 19980108; AU 3509297 A 19980121; AU 724349 B2 20000921; CA 2258846 A1 19980108; EP 0932578 A1 19990804; EP 0932578 A4 20000308; JP 2000515736 A 20001128

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020924

2001-12-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011106

2000-03-08 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000124

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT

2000-02-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 67D 5/08 A, 7A 23G 9/28 B, 7G 01F 1/10 B

1999-08-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6B 67D 5/08 A, 6A 23G 9/28 B

1999-08-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990125

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT