Global Patent Index - EP 0932645 A4

EP 0932645 A4 2000-09-13 - FLUOROPOLYMER DISPERSION COATINGS FROM MODIFIED THERMOPLASTIC VINYLIDENE FLUORIDE BASED RESINS

Title (en)

FLUOROPOLYMER DISPERSION COATINGS FROM MODIFIED THERMOPLASTIC VINYLIDENE FLUORIDE BASED RESINS

Title (de)

BESCHICHTUNGEN AUS FLUORPOLYMERDISPERSIONEN AUF BASIS VON MODIFIZIERTEN THERMOPLASTISCHEN VINYLIDENFLUORID-HARZEN

Title (fr)

REVETEMENTS FLUOROPOLYMERES EN DISPERSION FABRIQUES A PARTIR DE RESINES A BASE DE POLYFLUORURE DE VINYLIDENE

Publication

EP 0932645 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98933065 A

Priority

  • US 9813734 W
  • US 5164297 P
  • US 10876498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9901505A1] A paint base for dispersion coatings substrates comprising an acrylic modified fluoropolymer, paints and varnishes derived therefrom, coatings derived therefrom and articles coated with said coatings are disclosed. The coatings have improved gloss, flex, crack resistance and other improved use properties.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08L 27/12; B32B 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B32B 27/30 (2006.01); C08F 259/08 (2006.01); C09D 151/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08F 259/08 (2013.01); C09D 151/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 9901505A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9901505 A1 19990114; AU 735801 B2 20010712; AU 8281798 A 19990125; BR 9806106 A 19990831; CA 2264719 A1 19990114; CN 1278285 A 20001227; EA 001802 B1 20010827; EA 199900181 A1 19991229; EP 0932645 A1 19990804; EP 0932645 A4 20000913; JP 2002513442 A 20020508; KR 20000068392 A 20001125; NZ 335012 A 20000128

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030708

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030225

2000-10-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ATOFINA CHEMICALS, INC.

2000-09-13 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-08-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990325

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE