Global Patent Index - EP 0932708 B1

EP 0932708 B1 2001-12-05 - ELECTROLYSIS DEVICE

Title (en)

ELECTROLYSIS DEVICE

Title (de)

ELEKTROLYSEVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ELECTROLYSE

Publication

EP 0932708 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98941241 A

Priority

  • DE 9801770 W
  • DE 19729429 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19729429C1] An electrolysis device (1) has a number of membrane electrolytic cells (2) having each a membrane (4) provided on both sides with a contact layer. This device should be compact, suitable for relatively high hydrogen production rates and therefore particularly flexible to use. According to the invention, a contact plate (5) is arranged on each contact layer and each contact plate (5) has a channel system (14) for the transport of water and/or gas on its surface oriented towards the associated contact layer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25B 9/00; C25B 15/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25B 9/00 (2006.01); C25B 9/20 (2006.01); C25B 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25B 15/08 (2013.01); C25B 9/206 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19729429 C1 19990114; EP 0932708 A1 19990804; EP 0932708 B1 20011205; ES 2167922 T3 20020516; JP 2001500194 A 20010109; JP 3748896 B2 20060222; TW 495562 B 20020721; US RE38066 E 20030408; WO 9902761 A1 19990121

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150627

2016-07-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160727

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150626

2016-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-02-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150627

2016-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150626

2016-02-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-01-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802319

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140617

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140630

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140623

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-08-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AREVA GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AREVA NP GMBH, 91052 ERLANGEN, DE

- Document: DE 59802319

- Effective date: 20130618

2013-08-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59802319

- Representative's name: TERGAU & WALKENHORST PATENTANWAELTE - RECHTSAN, DE

- Effective date: 20130618

2013-08-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59802319

- Representative's name: TERGAU & WALKENHORST PATENTANWAELTE PARTGMBB, DE

- Effective date: 20130618

2013-06-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59802319

- Representative's name: TERGAU & WALKENHORST PATENTANWAELTE - RECHTSAN, DE

2010-08-27 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2010-08-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2008-08-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: AREVA NP GMBH

- Free text: FRAMATOME ANP GMBH#FREYESLEBENSTRASSE 1#91058 ERLANGEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- AREVA NP GMBH#PAUL-GOSSEN-STRASSE 100#91052 ERLANGEN (DE)

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FRAMATOME ANP GMBH

- Free text: FRAMATOME ANP GMBH#FREYESLEBENSTRASSE 1#91058 ERLANGEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- FRAMATOME ANP GMBH#FREYESLEBENSTRASSE 1#91058 ERLANGEN (DE)

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2167922 T3

2002-03-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020218

2002-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802319 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI SE

2001-09-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRAMATOME ANP GMBH

2000-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000719

1999-08-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990305

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI SE