Global patent index - EP 0932710 B1

EP 0932710 B1 2001-04-18 - AQUEOUS COAGULATING AGENT FOR LIQUID CRYSTAL SOLUTIONS WITH BASE OF CELLULOSE SUBSTANCES

Title (en)

AQUEOUS COAGULATING AGENT FOR LIQUID CRYSTAL SOLUTIONS WITH BASE OF CELLULOSE SUBSTANCES

Title (de)

WÄSSRIGE KOAGULATIONSMITTEL FÜR FLÜSSIGKRISTALLLÖSUNGEN AUF BASIS VON CELLULOSEHALTIGEN MATERIALEN

Title (fr)

AGENT COAGULANT AQUEUX POUR SOLUTIONS CRISTAL-LIQUIDE A BASE DE MATIERES CELLULOSIQUES

Publication

EP 0932710 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97912185 A

Priority

  • EP 9705676 W
  • FR 9612871 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9817848A1] The invention concerns an aqueous coagulating agent for a liquid crystal solution with a base of cellulose substances, characterised by the following: it contains water and at least one additive; when it is contacted with said solution, the diffusion kinetics (diffusion front D) of the coagulating agent and that of precipitation (precipitation front P) of the cellulose substances by the action of said agent, measured under the microscope for the so-called "coagulation test" for an additive proportion of 20 wt.%, comply with the following relationship: 0.55 < Kp/Kd </= 1, Kp and Kd being respectively the factors of diffusion and precipitation (respective "Fick" straight line gradients), expressed in mu m/s<1/2>. The invention also concerns a method for spinning a solution of liquid crystal solution with a base of cellulose substances, in particular the "dry-jet-wet-spinning" method, using a coagulating agent as per the invention as well as spun articles, fibers or films, obtained by this method.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01F 2/00; D01F 2/02; D01F 2/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08B 1/00 (2006.01); D01F 2/00 (2006.01); D01F 2/02 (2006.01); D01F 2/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01F 2/00 (2013.01); D01F 2/02 (2013.01); D01F 2/28 (2013.01); Y10T 428/249933 (2015.04); Y10T 428/249994 (2015.04); Y10T 428/249998 (2015.04); Y10T 428/25 (2013.01); Y10T 428/253 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9817848 A1 19980430; AT 200695 T 20010515; AU 4947597 A 19980515; BR 9711937 A 19990921; CA 2268789 A1 19980430; CN 1086428 C 20020619; CN 1241225 A 20000112; DE 69704631 D1 20010523; DE 69704631 T2 20010830; EP 0932710 A1 19990804; EP 0932710 B1 20010418; ES 2156369 T3 20010616; JP 2001507383 A 20010605; JP 4216340 B2 20090128; RU 2184804 C2 20020710; US 6342296 B1 20020129

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071015

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071016

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2009-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20071016

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071015

2008-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061016

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051003

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071015

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20071015

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061030

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061023

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061023

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-16 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061016

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061011

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-14 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051014

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-04-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010713

2001-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2156369

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-05-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69704631

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-23

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-04-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 200695

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-05-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000330

1999-08-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990518

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL