Global Patent Index - EP 0932723 B1

EP 0932723 B1 2002-11-20 - A ROLLER FOR GUIDING A MOVABLE WEB

Title (en)

A ROLLER FOR GUIDING A MOVABLE WEB

Title (de)

WALZE ZUM FÜHREN EINER BEWEGLICHEN WARENBAHN

Title (fr)

ROULEAU DE GUIDAGE D'UNE BANDE MOBILE

Publication

EP 0932723 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97942045 A

Priority

  • FI 9700561 W
  • FI 963710 A
  • FI 972400 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9812381A1] A roll guiding the travel of paper web, especially in a paper machine, at least a portion of whose mantle tube (1) rotates eccentrically with respect to the roll centre line (12) and the mantle is uniform and its material reinforced plastic or similar composite construction and the roll fitted with bearings by means of adjustable cylinder elements (5). The fitting-with-bearings of both mantle tube (1) ends comprises the said cylinder element, like bushing (5), which is non-rotating and on which at a distance from each other there are two bearings (4a, 4b) fitted to rotate the mantle tube (1) and to make the mantle tube curve by bending it and that there is between cylinder element and axle (2) a joint (8, 3) for adjustment of said cylinder element direction with respect to the said axle or the fastening body.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 1/02; D21F 1/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/40 (2006.01); D21G 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/40 (2013.01); D21G 1/0086 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9812381 A1 19980326; AT 228186 T 20021215; DE 69717298 D1 20030102; DE 69717298 T2 20030814; EP 0932723 A1 19990804; EP 0932723 B1 20021120

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110919

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 228186 T

- Effective date: 20110919

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100920

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-07-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69717298

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110919

2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091001

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100919

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100919

2011-05-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100927

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100922

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100914

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090922

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090915

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-05-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69717298 20030102

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228186 T 20021215

2002-08-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JOKINEN, KAI

2001-12-19 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: A ROLLER FOR GUIDING A MOVABLE WEB

2001-12-05 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: A ROLLER FOR GUIDING A MOVABLE WEB

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: METSO PAPER INC.

2001-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: METSO PAPER INC.

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010509

2000-08-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALMET CORPORATION

2000-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VALMET CORPORATION

1999-08-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990415

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE