Global Patent Index - EP 0932851 B1

EP 0932851 B1 2001-01-10 - MODULAR ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC MULTICOLOR PRINTER

Title (en)

MODULAR ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC MULTICOLOR PRINTER

Title (de)

MODULARER ELEKTROFOTOGRAFISCHER MEHRFARBEN-DRUCKER

Title (fr)

IMPRIMANTE MULTICOLORE ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIQUE MODULAIRE

Publication

EP 0932851 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97913107 A

Priority

  • DE 9702389 W
  • DE 19642890 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9818056A1] The present invention concerns an electrophotographic printer (10) designed to print on the carrier of a final image (18). It includes a conveyor (16) for said carrier (18), a first printing unit (60) for producing the first powder image on a first photoconductor, at least another printing unit for producing another powder image on another photoconductor, a device for the direct or indirect transmission of the first powder image and the other powder image on part of the surface, on the recto of the final image carrier (18), and a sub-group intended to receive the first printing unit in a first housing (I) and another printing unit in another housing (II), both housings (I, II) having a substantially similar structure, while the first printing unit and/or the other printing unit is removeably mounted in the sub-group (20).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/01; G03G 21/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/01 (2006.01); G03G 15/23 (2006.01); G03G 21/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/231 (2013.01); G03G 15/0184 (2013.01); G03G 21/1604 (2013.01); G03G 21/1619 (2013.01); G03G 15/0194 (2013.01); G03G 2215/00459 (2013.01); G03G 2215/017 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9818056 A1 19980430; DE 19781184 D2 19991014; EP 0932851 A1 19990804; EP 0932851 B1 20010110; EP 0967529 A2 19991229; EP 0967529 A3 20000315; EP 0967529 B1 20010816; US 2004179868 A1 20040916; US 6253054 B1 20010626

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-01 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140904 AND 20140910

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-08-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140630

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131016

2014-07-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59702908

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131016

2014-06-13 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Effective date: 20140513

2013-10-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS GMBH, 85586 POING, DE

- Document: DE 59702908

- Effective date: 20130820

2013-10-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59702908

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAUMBURG, THOENES, THURN, LAN, DE

- Effective date: 20130820

2013-08-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59702908

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAUMBURG, THOENES, THURN, LAN, DE

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121025

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121113

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-04-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702908 20010215

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-07-19 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: MODULAR ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC MULTICOLOR PRINTER

1999-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990927

1999-08-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990517

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB