Global Patent Index - EP 0932852 B1

EP 0932852 B1 2000-05-31 - METHOD OF MULTICOLOR ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC PRINTING WITH UNIPOLAR TONER

Title (en)

METHOD OF MULTICOLOR ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC PRINTING WITH UNIPOLAR TONER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM MEHRFARBIGEN ELEKTROFOTOGRAFISCHEN DRUCKEN MIT UNIPOLAREM TONER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'IMPRESSION ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIQUE MULTICOLORE AVEC TONER UNIPOLAIRE

Publication

EP 0932852 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97945762 A

Priority

  • DE 9702414 W
  • DE 19642891 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9818058A1] The present invention pertains to a method for electrophotographically printing a multicoloured image, comprising the following steps: a) surface elements of a layer system are loaded on a negative initial potential (step S1); b) the surface elements are exposed to varying degrees (step S2); c) the surface elements are processed with negative particles of a third colour (step S3); d) the surface elements are arranged near a source of light scattered in a substantially homogenous manner (step S5); e) the surface elements are processed with negative particles of a second colour (step S6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/0152 (2013.01); G03G 15/0163 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9818058 A1 19980430; DE 19781188 D2 19991223; EP 0932852 A1 19990804; EP 0932852 B1 20000531; US 6205311 B1 20010320

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081016

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-07-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20081016

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081230

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071019

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071025

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-09-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701825

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-06

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990908

1999-08-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990514

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB