Global Patent Index - EP 0933041 A3

EP 0933041 A3 2001-03-28 - Protection device for protecting the face against hairspray or coloured sprays

Title (en)

Protection device for protecting the face against hairspray or coloured sprays

Title (de)

Schutzvorrichtung zum Schutz des Gesichts gegen Haarspray oder Farbsprühnebel

Title (fr)

Dispositif de protection du visage lors d'atomisation de produit pour cheveux ou de peinture

Publication

EP 0933041 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98105498 A

Priority

DE 29801020 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0933041A2] The device protects from hairspray (12) when being sprayed on hair. There is a screen (1) with a head (16) gripping device for the user which goes in front of the persons face. The screen is a thin, stiffly-flexible plastics sheet which has attachment elements (2,3,4,6,7,8) with a partly opening elastically sprung face clip (5) acting as a holding strap for the face screen. The plastics sheet (1) in front of the end clip may be in a relaxed state and the attachment element (2,3,4) may be equally spaced from the other attachment element (6,7,8) and the plastics sheet may be attached to each other in a detachable way.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 44/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 44/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 44/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29801020 U1 19980326; EP 0933041 A2 19990804; EP 0933041 A3 20010328

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011001

2002-01-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI